Case Information: 55389 | |||
Short Caption: | FITZGERALD (MAURICE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C249014 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 10-03363 | |
02/05/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/05/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-03364 | |
03/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $ 500 due: 15 days or Rough Draft Transcript Request due: 10 days. (Faxed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-05506 | |
03/18/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 10-07276 | |
03/18/2010 | Transcript Request | Received Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (FILED PER ORDER 06/29/10). Request for Rough Draft Transcript. | 10-07278 | |
04/06/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Court Reporter Kerry Esparza. | 10-08888 | |
05/07/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. we grant the motion. The clerk shall file the Certificate of Acknowledgment received on April 20, 2010. | 10-11821 | |
05/07/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/5/10, 1/21/10. | 10-10323 | |
05/25/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to Appear and Show Cause. We direct Mr. Sanft to appear pesonally before this court on June 16, 2010, at 2:00 p.m., in Las Vegas. Mr. Sanft shall be prepared to show cause why he should not be removed as counsel of record in these appeals and prohibited from practicing in this court. Any evidence which Mr. Sanft desires to present on his behalf shall be filed in affidavit form on or before June 11, 2010. Nos. 54923/54997/55389. | 10-13611 | |
06/16/2010 | Other | Other. Received check no. 3431 in the amount of $500.00 from attorney Michael Sanft in payment of sanctions due to Supreme Court Law Library. | ||
06/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Opening Brief and Appendix in Docket No. 54923, Fast Track Statements and Appendices in Docket Nos. 54997 and 55389 due: 15 days. Nos. 54923/54997/55389. | 10-16954 | |
06/29/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 01/05/10 and 01/21/10. Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza. Filed in district court on: 03/16/10. | 10-07278 | |
07/19/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-18398 | |
07/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. CD attached to appendix. | 10-18399 | |
08/04/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-20079 | |
08/04/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 10-20080 | |
11/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 10-29077 | |
11/30/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-30974 | |
11/30/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 9, 2010. | 10-30974 |