Case Information: 51629 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: AMERCO DERIVATIVE LITIGATION | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41563 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0205602 Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0206331 Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0302482 Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0302617 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/16/2008 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 07/07/2010 at 10:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 07/07/2010 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lewis & Roca check no. 600319. | ||
05/14/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-12176 | |
05/16/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford Levitt | 08-12390 | |
05/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Parsons Behle & Latimer check no. 1994. | ||
05/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | 08-13381 | |
05/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Laxalt & Nomura, Ltd. check no. 37396. | ||
05/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | 08-13382 | |
05/30/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 03/30/07. Court Reporter: Debora Ann Kreidler. | 08-13640 | |
05/30/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Respondents/Cross-Appellants. | 08-13758 | |
06/02/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Joinder. Appellants/Cross-Respondents (Glennbrook Capital, Kahn, Belec & Paul F. Shoen). See docketing statement for list of counsel included joinder. | 08-13832 | |
06/05/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Docketing Statement. Respondent (Calvin R.X. Dunlap and Associates, Mark Shoen, SAC Holding, SAC Holding II & 3-27 SAC Self-Storage). | 08-14270 | |
06/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from McDonald Carano Wilson check no. 67185. | ||
06/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | 08-14501 | |
06/10/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | 08-14668 | |
06/10/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Calvin X. Dunlap check no. 18162. | ||
06/16/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. Response to Cross-Appellants' Joint Docketing Statement. | 08-15195 | |
06/23/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellants (Dodds, Herrera, Johnson, Bayer, Brogan & Grogan). | 08-15939 | |
07/08/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Law Firm of Latham and Watkins, LLP. | 08-17366 | |
07/11/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Joint Docketing Statement. (Respondents/Cross-Appellants E. Shoen/J. Shoen/W. Carty/Dodds/Herrera/Johnson/Bayer/Brogan/Grogan). | 08-17812 | |
08/13/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 9/4/08. | 08-20882 | |
01/12/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. | 09-00817 | |
01/13/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-00977 | |
02/02/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Representing Appellant/Cross-Respondent (Belec). Firm Name Change. Robbins Umeda LLP (formerly Robbins Umeda & Fink). | 09-02907 | |
03/16/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants/Cross-Respondents and respondents/cross-appellants: 15 days to request transcripts; Each appellant 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 09-06569 | |
03/31/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/30/07. To Court Reporter: Deborah Ann Kreidler. Joint Request for Transcripts of Proceedings. (Appellants/Cross-Respondents and Respondents/Cross-Appellants). | 09-08045 | |
04/01/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of Service. (Joint Request for Transcript of Proceedings). | 09-08234 | |
04/28/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Cross-Appeals (Appellants/Cross-Respondents (Glennbrook Capital, Kahn, Belec & Paul F. Shoen) | 09-10466 | |
05/04/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondents' and Cross-Appellants' Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Dismiss. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant (Amerco)) | 09-11031 | |
06/12/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 15, 2009. | 09-14742 | |
07/16/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols 1-14. | 09-17434 | |
07/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. . . . We dismiss the cross-appeals. We remind appellants that the opening brief(s) and appendix are due July 15, 2009. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 09-17653 | |
07/20/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-17765 | |
07/30/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Notice of Firm Change of Address (Robbins Umeda, LLP). | 09-18676 | |
08/17/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondents Mark Shoen and the Sac Entities. | 09-19916 | |
08/17/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondents Dodds, Herrera, Johnson, Bayer, Brogan, and Grogan. | 09-19963 | |
08/17/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Amerco. | 09-19968 | |
08/18/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondents Edward J. Shoen, James P. Shoen, and William E. Carty. | 09-20036 | |
09/14/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 19, 2009. | 09-22213 | |
10/22/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Reply Brief. | 09-25841 | |
10/22/2009 | Brief | Received Reply Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 11/06/09). | 09-25842 | |
11/05/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Errata and Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply Brief. | 09-27068 | |
11/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limit. We direct the clerk of this court to file appellants' reply brief received on October 22, 2009. | 09-27200 | |
11/06/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-25842 | |
12/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply Brief. The clerk of this court shall file the amended reply brief received on November 5, 2009. | 09-31080 | |
12/23/2009 | Brief | Filed Amended Brief. Amended Reply Brief. | 09-27069 | |
05/19/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on July 7, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. (En Banc) | 10-13091 | |
06/10/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Associate Counsel. (George Brandon) | 10-15115 | |
06/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Attorney George Brandon of the Squire, Sanders & Dempsey, L.L.P., law firm shall be allowed to appear on behalf of Mark Shoen and the SAC entities in this appeal. Attorney Calvin R.X. Dunlap shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Brandon in this matter. | 10-16090 | |
06/22/2010 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities. Nominal Defendant/Respondent Amerco's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | 10-16277 | |
06/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Associate Counsel. Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr. | 10-16603 | |
06/28/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Nominal Defendant/Respondent Amerco's Notice of SCR 42 Pro Hac Vice Admission. | 10-16726 | |
06/28/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Nominal Defendant/Respondent Amerco's Notice of Appearance for Purposes of Oral Argument. | 10-16729 | |
06/28/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 10-16789 | |
06/29/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument and Pro Hac Vice Admission by Defendants/Respondents Mark Shoen and the SAC Entities. | 10-16938 | |
06/29/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notices of Appearance for Oral Argument and Pro Hac Vice Admission by Defendants/Respondents William E. Carty, Edward J. Shoen and James P. Shoen. | 10-16967 | |
06/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. No motion for disqualification has been filed, any party objecting to my participation in the decision of this appeal should notify the clerk of this court in writing prior to oral argument on July 7, 2010 (James W. Hardesty). | 10-16973 | |
06/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Disclosure of Non-Disqualifying Interest. Any party objecting to my participation in the decision of this appeal should notify the clerk of this court in writing, explaining the basis therefore, prior to oral argument (Kristina Pickering). | 10-16980 | |
06/29/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument and Pro Hac Vice Admission by Respondents Charles J. Bayer, John P. Brogan, John M. Dodds, James J. Grogan, Richard Herrera and Aubrey Johnson. | 10-17014 | |
07/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Mr. Polsenberg shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Tabacoo in this matter. | 10-17263 | |
07/02/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Statement of Fact of Death of Plaintiff Ron Belec. | 10-17307 | |
07/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/02/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Substitute Max Belec as Plaintiff/Appellant. | 10-22577 | |
09/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Substitution of a Party. We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption on this court's docket to reflect substitution. | 10-24588 | |
05/12/2011 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Parraguirre. Concur/dissent: Pickering, J. 127 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 17. EN BANC | 11-14103 | |
06/06/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-16447 | |
06/06/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/10/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2011. | 11-16447 | |
08/24/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 50262/52496, 54779, 55159, 49732, 51629, 53436/54173, 55228, 50668, 57649, 53518, 54165, 46623, and 53225/53340. (Letter entered in 50262 as document no. 11-26481.) | ||
09/28/2011 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter dated 09/20/2011 from Vanessa Becker at Holland & Hart re: Notice Concerning Screening of Stephan Hollandsworth. | 11-29510 |