Case Information: 55381 | |||
Short Caption: | DAVIS (SHAWN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0912092 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/04/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-03195 | |
02/04/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/04/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-03196 | |
02/11/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 12/21/09, 1/25/10. Court Reporter: JoAnn Malone. Filed in district court on: 2/4/10. | 10-03793 | |
03/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-06143 | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. extension for time. Appellant: Fast track statement and appendix due 4/15/10. | 10-06517 | |
04/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 10-09346 | |
05/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-12083 | |
05/10/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |