Case Information: 49685 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBERTS (DELL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41076 , 44993 , 50479 , 52330 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR022249 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/26/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/26/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-13904 | |
07/16/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel in the proceedings below, attorney David O'Mara, shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why these appeals should not be dismissed. Nos. 49685/49742-cases are not consolidated. | 07-15319 | |
08/08/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 49685/49742-cases are not consolidated. | 07-17412 | |
08/16/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. Nos. 49685/49742. - not consoldiated. | 07-18085 | |
09/11/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-18586 | |
09/11/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/25/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 19, 2007. | 07-18586 |