Case Information: 55378 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE, SECRETARY OF STATE, MILLER VS. LANGENBURG RESEARCH | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A558195 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/08/2010 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/04/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-03180 | |
02/04/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/08/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost | 10-03445 | |
02/22/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-04713 | |
02/22/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | 10-04723 | |
03/08/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 3/22/10 | 10-06042 | |
03/09/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement Served on Settlement Judge. | 10-06092 | |
03/15/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Attorney Kelly Swanson. | 10-06777 | |
03/29/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Notice of Reappearance of Attorney. Representing respondent: Kelly H. Swanson, Esq. | 10-08095 | |
04/16/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Attorney Kelly Swanson has rescinded his prior notice of withdrawal of counsel for respondent. As all parties are now represented by counsel, settlement judge shall continue with settlement proceedings. Final Settlement Program Status Report Due: 8/9/10 | 10-10063 | |
06/15/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 6/14/10 | 10-15511 | |
06/21/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. The parties will submit a stipulation to vacate the appeal and a request that the case be remanded back to the district court. | 10-16109 | |
07/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Vacate Appeal and Remand | 10-18488 | |
09/15/2010 | Settlement Order/Dispositional | Order Dismissing Appeal/Remand/Settlement. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, "we dismiss this appeal." This matter is remanded to the district court to conduct appropriate proceedings. In the event the district court declines to grant the requested relief, appellant(s) may file a motion to reinstate this appeal. | 10-23768 |