Case Information: 55392 | |||
Short Caption: | ORTIZ (FRANK) VS. NEV. BD. OF PAROLE COMM'RS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 09EW000211B | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/28/2011 | How Submitted: | On Documents |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-03608 | |
02/09/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-04880 | |
03/01/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | 10-05314 | |
05/18/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 10-12858 | |
05/18/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/28/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. On February 24, 2010, appellant filed a letter requesting that this court send him the civil proper person pilot program forms. We construe the February 24 letter as a motion. Having considered the motion, we grant it. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall provide appellant with a Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement, a Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form, and the Instructions for Civil Litigants Without Attorneys. Appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file and serve the Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Also, on May 24, 2010, appellant sent a letter enclosing documents from his federal action. These documents are not properly before this court in the context of this appeal from a state court order. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to detach the exhibits attached to the May 24 letter and return them, unfiled, to appellant. | 10-19513 | |
08/20/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-21462 | |
02/28/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/21/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-35855 | |
12/19/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-38987 | |
12/19/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
12/21/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 20, 2011. | 11-38987 |