Case Information: 55390 | |||
Short Caption: | SNURE (THEODORE) VS. DIRECTOR | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47229 , 63856 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR060039 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/12/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-03600 | |
02/09/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/16/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-04010 | |
03/16/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-06896 | |
03/16/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1-2. (CD attached to Appendices) | 10-06900 | |
03/29/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-08177 | |
05/12/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed. | ||
07/02/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Nonreply. | 10-17375 | |
09/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-23200 | |
10/06/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-26005 | |
10/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
10/20/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 11, 2010. | 10-26005 |