Case Information: 55391 | |||
Short Caption: | FLOYD (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR0005779 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 12/13/2010 at 2:00 PM | Oral Argument Location: | Regional Justice Center |
Submission Date: | 12/13/2010 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/09/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-03602 | |
03/08/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 10-06049 | |
03/12/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-06538 | |
06/02/2010 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 16, 2010. | 10-14145 | |
06/14/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. E-filed document shows case number as 53391. | 10-15369 | |
06/15/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Opening Brief. | 10-15477 | |
06/16/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Certificate of Mailing - Opening Brief and Appendix. | 10-15640 | |
06/16/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 10-15703 | |
06/22/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-16233 | |
07/22/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. E-filed document shows case number as 53391. | 10-18868 | |
11/09/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for December 13, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel in Las Vegas. | 10-29395 | |
12/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 10-31152 | |
12/09/2010 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Authorities Pursuant to NRAP 31(a). | 10-32222 | |
12/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Oral Argument Held this Day. Case Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/03/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Vacating Judgment and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court VACATED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | 11-03433 | |
02/15/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | 11-04983 | |
02/16/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Mailing-Petition for Rehearing. | 11-05019 | |
05/09/2011 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | 11-13679 | |
05/13/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 11-14320 | |
05/13/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 11-14346 | |
06/29/2011 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | 11-19298 | |
07/25/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-22291 | |
07/25/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/01/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 27, 2011. | 11-22291 |