Case Information: 55382 | |||
Short Caption: | FIDDLER VS. STAGLIANO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 08TRT000071B | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/19/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/04/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/04/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-03202 | |
02/04/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-03203 | |
02/18/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 10-04450 | |
02/18/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal, NRAP 24. | 10-04451 | |
04/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. | 10-08645 | |
04/02/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/07/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | 10-09017 | |
04/15/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-09860 | |
05/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 10-11453 | |
05/06/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated Docket Sheet. | 10-11718 | |
05/19/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 10-13096 | |
05/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/20/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP fn1[As the transcript of the district court's only hearing in the underlying case was included in the record on appeal, we deny appellant's request for transcripts. We further deny all other requests for relief in appellant's civil proper person appeal statement.] | 10-18564 | |
07/26/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 7/20/10 addressed to Mark Daniel Fiddler. Per NDOC, Mark Fiddler has been "paroled". No forwarding address. | 10-19295 | |
08/13/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-19277 | |
08/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/20/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 16, 2010. | 10-19277 |