Case Information: 55374 | |||
Short Caption: | SAKAY (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36988 , 41623 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156584 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Douglas, Gibbons, Saitta | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Parraguirre for Justice Douglas | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/09/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/03/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-03047 | |
02/03/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/03/2010 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
02/17/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 10-04276 | |
03/09/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. | 10-06086 | |
03/09/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/06/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justices Douglas and Saitta sat in district court proceedings. | 10-08841 | |
05/07/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[We have considered the proper person documents submitted in this matter, and we conclude that no relief is warranted for the reason set forth above.] SNP10-RP/JH/KP | 10-11803 | |
06/01/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-12660 | |
06/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2010. | 10-12660 |