Case Information: 51630 | |||
Short Caption: | COLLIER (WILLIAM) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41299 , 41364 , 48174 , 50020 , 50339 , 50887 , 51259 , 57880 , 57881 , 57882 , 58991 , 59195 , 59463 , 59963 , 60937 , 62859 , 63761 , 63878 , 65551 , 66668 , 66668-COA , 66885 , 66885-COA , 67348 , 68415 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C187074 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/15/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/15/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-12213 | |
06/18/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Fn3 [We have considered all proper person documents submitted in this matter, and we conclude that no relief is warranted.] [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-15548 | |
07/15/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-17892 | |
07/15/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/25/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2008. | 08-17892 | |
09/08/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. No good cause appearing, this court denies the relief requested on 8/18/08 and 8/25/08. No further documents will be permitted to be filed in this appeal. | 08-23015 |