Case Information: 51626 | |||
Short Caption: | MURROW (GREGORY) VS. STATE C/W 51623/51624/51625 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 51623 *, 51624 , 51625 , 51626 | Related Case(s): | 45348 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR041814 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/14/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-12153 | |
05/15/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-12210 | |
05/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 51623/51624/51625/51626. | 08-12553 | |
06/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion and Consolidating Appeals. We grant appellant's motion and consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix in Docket No. 51623 in Docket Nos. 51624, 62625 and 51626. Fast Track Response due: 20 days. Nos. 51623/51624/51625/51626 (08-15945). | ||
06/23/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Nos. 51623/51624/51625/51626 (08-14538). (Filed per order of 06/23/08). | ||
06/23/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Nos. 51623/51624/51625/51626 (08-14539). (Filed per order of 06/23/08). | ||
06/23/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. /Confession of Error/Request for Remand and Evidentiary Hearing. Nos. 51623/51624/51625/51626 (08-15981). | ||
06/23/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. Nos. 51623/51624/51625/51626 (08-15982). | ||
10/01/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP08C-MC/WM/NS Nos. 51623/51624/51625/51626 | 08-25411 | |
10/28/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-26287 | |
10/28/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/04/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Received Notice. Notice of Change of Address for Appellant Gregory Murrow. Nos. 51624/51625/51626 (08-28178). | ||
11/10/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 3, 2008. | 08-26287 |