Case Information: 55376 | |||
Short Caption: | GUDELIS VS. TROGLIA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A558854 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/08/2010 / Smith, Jay | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/03/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-03066 | |
02/03/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/03/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-03071 | |
02/03/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 10-03072 | |
02/08/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith | 10-03441 | |
02/16/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from The Cooper Castle Law Firm. Check No. 341404. | ||
02/16/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-04027 | |
02/16/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | 10-04028 | |
02/26/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Dcoketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 10-05114 | |
03/17/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a conference has been scheduled for 5/14/10 | 10-07120 | |
05/12/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 26, 2010. | 10-12384 | |
06/04/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued for a second session to 6/23/10 | 10-14493 | |
06/25/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter | 10-16696 | |
06/30/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix; 10 days to file case appeal statement. | 10-17044 | |
07/09/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 10-17772 | |
07/15/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-18302 | |
07/19/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. | 10-18333 | |
07/19/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-18334 | |
08/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Appellants. Juliana M. Hofsommer. | 10-21782 | |
09/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause counsel to enter an appearance in this court. If new counsel is not retained, then this appeal shall proceed in proper person with respect to appellants Maria Gudelis and Rudolph Straat. If appellant Panther Valley Funding fails to retain counsel, its appeal will be dismissed. We suspend the briefing schedule for this appeal pending further order of this court. | 10-22878 | |
10/28/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Response due: 10 days. Briefing remains suspended. | 10-28317 | |
12/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." | 10-32121 | |
01/03/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-00057 | |
01/03/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/21/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 11, 2011. | 11-00057 |