judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMPSON (GERALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36310
Short Caption:THOMPSON (GERALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39060
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C142211Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/20/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10510
08/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-13355
08/30/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15313
09/15/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15422
09/15/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. We have reviewed the petition and conclude that en banc reconsideration of the panel's decisions is not warranted. " . . . we deny the petition." En Banc RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB 00-18416
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-15422