Case Information: 55367 | |||
Short Caption: | ABEYTA (ANTHONY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 59446 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C249794 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/03/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-02929 | |
02/03/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/03/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-02930 | |
02/03/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 10-02932 | |
02/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order and Order Suspending Briefing. District Court Order due: 30 days. | 10-03439 | |
02/17/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-04180 | |
02/19/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 3, 2010. Judgment of Conviction (Plea of Guilty). | 10-04569 | |
02/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. Request for Rough Draft Transcripts due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 50 days. | 10-05181 | |
03/15/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Case Appeal Statement and Rough Draft Transcript Request From due: 10 days. | 10-06730 | |
04/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $ 500 due: 15 days or Case Appeal Statement and Transcript Request Form due: 10 days. (Faxed to counsel for appellant). | 10-09521 | |
04/13/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 10-09568 | |
05/07/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Vacating Conditional Sanction and Directing Filing of Documents. Mr Winder: 10 days to file certified copy of the rough draft transcript request form and proof of service of the rough draft transcript request form. We vacate the sanction imposed on April 12, 2010. Mr. Winder: 10 days to file fast track statement and appendix or a motion for an extension if time. Counsel cautioned. | 10-11801 | |
05/28/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Imposing Sanctions. Mr. Winder: 15 days to pay $500 and provide this court with proof of such payment. 10 days to file transcript request and fast track statement and appendix. | 10-13960 | |
06/03/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Ex-Parte Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Fast Track Statement & Appendix | 10-14240 | |
06/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Motion Granted in Part. Mr. Winder: 60 days to file the fast track statement and appendix. Counsel reminded that sanction imposed in the May 28, 2010 order and proof of payment is due June 14, 2010. | 10-15247 | |
06/18/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Filing Proof of Payment to Supreme Court Law Library | 10-15903 | |
06/22/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/26/10. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. | 10-16247 | |
08/11/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-20709 | |
08/13/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. CD-ROM included. | 10-20932 | |
08/31/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. (This document contains cover, index, and cert of service only). | 10-22334 | |
08/31/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-22331 | |
09/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. (SEALED) | 10-22572 | |
11/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 10-29051 | |
11/30/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-30971 | |
11/30/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 9, 2010. | 10-30971 |