Case Information: 55373 | |||
Short Caption: | SANCHEZ (ALFONSO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C256629 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/03/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-03040 | |
02/03/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/01/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/13/09, 10/19/09, 10/20/09, 12/15/09, 1/7/10, 1/21/10. | 10-05383 | |
03/15/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement | 10-06853 | |
03/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Transccript and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Court Reporter Debbie Winn's Certificate of Delivery due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 29, 2010. | 10-07393 | |
03/31/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/27/09. | 10-08356 | |
03/31/2010 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 8/27/09. Court Reporter: Debra Winn. | 10-08357 | |
04/30/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-11102 | |
04/30/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 10-11104 | |
05/20/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-13179 | |
09/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | 10-23048 | |
10/04/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-25623 | |
10/04/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 11, 2010. | 10-25623 |