Case Information: 55363 | |||
Short Caption: | CINA (ERIC) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51366 , 59998 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C221236 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/19/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/03/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-02903 | |
02/03/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-04876 | |
05/19/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. | 10-13077 | |
05/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/16/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | 10-29903 | |
12/13/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-32455 | |
12/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/28/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 21, 2010. | 10-32455 |