judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH (WILLIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51627
Short Caption:SMITH (WILLIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43097 , 44333 , 45040 , 46082 , 47846 , 50551 , 53573 , 54096 , 58880 , 67819 , 67819-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C197707Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/04/2008How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/14/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/14/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 08-12159
06/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. . Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-13961
07/10/2008Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on July 2, 2008. Order Denying Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 08-17634
08/04/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. 08-20132
08/04/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/17/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn6 [We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-32033
01/13/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-00407
01/13/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/21/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 15, 2009. 09-00407