Case Information: 55406 | |||
Short Caption: | YONKER CONST., INC. VS. HULME | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - CV00073 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/16/2010 / Wasick, David | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Rollston, Henderson, Crabb & Johnson check no. 17518. | ||
02/10/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-03716 | |
02/16/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick | 10-03995 | |
02/22/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-04681 | |
02/26/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | 10-05145 | |
02/26/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Response to Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | 10-05146 | |
03/02/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 28, 2010. | 10-05481 | |
03/03/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Response to Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 10-05567 | |
03/03/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/28/10 | ||
05/19/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 6/14/10 | 10-13033 | |
06/16/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 7/20/10 | 10-15644 | |
07/21/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-18801 | |
07/22/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-18952 | |
07/26/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-19098 | |
08/27/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. | 10-22119 | |
09/15/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show. Cause Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Submitted By Yonker Construction, Inc. | 10-23755 | |
12/07/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Conditional Settlement. | 10-31825 | |
12/30/2010 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Dismissed." Before Hardesty, Douglas and Pickering, JJ. Majority: Hardesty, Douglas, Pickering. 126 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 54. SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-34024 | |
01/24/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-02342 | |
01/24/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
02/02/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 26, 2011. | 11-02342 |