Case Information: 55385 | |||
Short Caption: | KAUFMAN (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR092194 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 10-03265 | |
02/05/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/05/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-03267 | |
02/09/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 12/30/09, 11/18/09. Court Reporter: I. Zihn. Filed in district court on: 2/9/10. | 10-03660 | |
02/16/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 10-04025 | |
02/24/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Isolde Zihn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/18/09, 12/30/09. | 10-04927 | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-06393 | |
03/11/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |