Case Information: 55386 | |||
Short Caption: | ANGEL VS. ELDORADO CASINO, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52873 , 56428 , 58513 , 59401 , 63400 , 68076 , 68076-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0801899 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/05/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-03270 | |
02/18/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-04440 | |
04/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-09286 | |
05/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-10009 | |
05/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 11, 2010. | 10-10009 |