Case Information: 49694 | |||
Short Caption: | SHETTER VS. DIST. CT. (SHETTER) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 31576 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/26/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Martin Crowley (American Legal & Secretarial--check no. 10835). | ||
06/26/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. | 07-13938 | |
06/26/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. | 07-13940 | |
06/28/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Completed certificate of service on district judge. Due Date: 10 days | 07-14124 | |
07/11/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Affidavit of Service. | 07-15080 | |
09/10/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER we DENY mandamus relief. We DENY prohibition relief." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 07-19821 | |
10/05/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-20184 | |
10/05/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |