judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CONTINENTAL COMMUNITIES VS. DIELMAN

Case Information: 49715
Short Caption:CONTINENTAL COMMUNITIES VS. DIELMANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A496887Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/03/2007 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/14/2009How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/28/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Sklar Warren & Williams, LLP--check no. 3635.
06/28/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-14153
07/03/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. 07-14543
07/13/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/25/07. Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. 07-15223
07/18/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/25/07. To Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. 07-15651
07/20/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 07-15897
08/07/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-17309
08/07/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-17311
08/07/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Completed proof of service including settlement judge 07-17312
08/14/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on parties and settlement judge. 07-17887
10/12/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-22601
02/08/2008Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 45 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 08-03256
03/26/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 4/23/08. 08-07439
06/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanction of $500.00 due: 15 days or opening brief or motion due: 10 days. 08-13987
06/19/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second request. 08-15668
07/01/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. 08-16746
07/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. appellant shall have five days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. 08-16956
07/03/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-17048
07/03/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols 1-7. 08-17049
07/11/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Michael Kulwin. 08-17868
07/31/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. (Respondents Dieleman and Tracht). Brief due: August 29, 2008. 08-19901
08/04/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. (Mortgage Mart and Vallareale). Brief due: August 29, 2008. 08-20088
08/28/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. Answering Brief of Mortgage Mart, Crowne Realty, and Christopher Villareale. 08-22178
09/03/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Roger Dieleman and Violet Tract. 08-22630
09/03/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Roger Dieleman and Violet Tract. 08-22632
09/25/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 29, 2008. 08-24800
11/03/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Motion. 08-28015
11/17/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: 7 days. 08-29175
11/17/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. 08-29221
12/05/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on December 1, 2008. 08-30980
12/05/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-30436
05/14/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 09-11949
05/14/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/03/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. 09-18894
08/28/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-19252
08/28/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/09/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2009. 09-19252