judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AWAND VS. DOOR CONTROLS SERVICES

Case Information: 49714
Short Caption:AWAND VS. DOOR CONTROLS SERVICESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A490551Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/03/2007 / Osko, EugeneSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/30/2008How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/28/2007OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger.
06/28/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bowen Monson, LLC--check no. 1035.
06/28/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-14143
06/28/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Maupin (Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger) 07-14144
07/03/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eugene Osko. 07-14561
07/20/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 07-15895
07/20/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-15922
07/23/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger-check no. 087268.
07/23/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 07-16115
07/23/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Parties are advised to notify this court immediately if a change of designation of parties is desired. 07-16117
07/24/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Corrected notice issued regarding the designation of parties. 07-16207
07/24/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent docketing statement due: July 30, 2007. 07-16219
08/02/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 07-16997
08/07/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-17307
08/09/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 07-17536
08/09/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement. 07-17538
08/17/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement upon Settlement Judge. 07-18212
08/23/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-18703
09/12/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant and respondent: 15 days to request transcripts; Appellant: 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 07-20123
10/01/2007Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant) 07-21579
10/01/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. Transcripts requested: 09/11/06, 10/09/06, and 01/22/07. To Court Reporter: 8th JDC Dept. XIII. 07-21655
10/03/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 07-21836
11/19/2007TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Leta Haupt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/09/06 and 01/22/07. 07-25190
12/04/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we elect to apply the amended version of NRAP 9(b) to the transcripts listed in Ms. Haupt's notice. Appellant shall include copies of the October 9, 2006, and January 22, 2007, transcripts in the appendix to the opening brief, and Ms. Haupt is not obligated to file copies of the transcripts in this court. A review of the district court minute entries indicates that there was no court reporter present during the proceedings held on September 11, 2006. Accordingly, Ms. Haupt is not obligated to file a copy of this transcript in this court. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] 07-26114
12/18/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 10, 2008. 07-27381
01/14/2008MotionFiled Stipulation. 08-00897
01/16/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent: Opening Brief due: 1/24/08. 08-01227
01/29/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-02304
01/29/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 08-02306
02/27/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 27, 2008. 08-04840
03/28/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-07754
04/04/2008MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Cross Appeal. 08-08530
04/14/2008BriefReceived Answering Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 05/09/08). 08-09222
05/09/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Dismissing Cross-Appeal and Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answering brief and appendix received on April 14, 2008. Reply Brief due: 30 days (if deemed necessary). Door Control Services, Inc.'s motion for voluntary dismissal of the cross-appeal is granted. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption to reflect the dismissal of DCS's cross-appeal. 08-11578
05/09/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-09222
05/09/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 08-09224
05/12/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 9, 2008. 08-11773
07/14/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-18042
07/14/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 08-18046
09/30/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and briefs file herein, as of the date of this order. 08-25261
09/30/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/26/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. of Firm Name Change (Bowen Law Offices). 09-13012
12/04/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG fn1[To the extent that Door Control seeks sanctions for alleged deficiencies in Awand's opening brief and appendix, we decline to award sanctions.] 09-29426
12/29/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-30362
12/29/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2010. 09-30362