Case Information: 49696 | |||
Short Caption: | ORTIZ VS. ORTIZ | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41865 , 46266 , 54252 , 56055 , 58044 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D264471 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/26/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/26/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-13968 | |
07/11/2007 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter dated July 9, 2007 regarding respondents. | 07-15108 | |
07/11/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 07-15107 | |
08/08/2007 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-17461 | |
10/11/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." fn3[In light of this order, we deny as moot appellant's transcript request filed on July 11, 2007.] NNP08G-MG/MC/NS | 07-22457 | |
11/06/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-22590 | |
11/06/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/16/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2007. | 07-22590 |