Case Information: 49729 | |||
Short Caption: | MCKENRICK VS. CLISHE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A467585 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 07/24/2007 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/29/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from J.E. Ring Smith - check no. 339. | ||
06/29/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-14360 | |
07/06/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-14726 | |
07/24/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. | 07-16215 | |
08/20/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-18351 | |
09/24/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 7, 2007. | 07-20975 | |
11/13/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 07-24705 | |
11/20/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 07-25323 | |
11/30/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/27/07 and 05/16/07. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez. | 07-25858 | |
12/21/2007 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Norma Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/27/07. | 07-27765 | |
01/18/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Transcripts. Certificate of delivery for the May 16, 2007 transcript due: 20 days from court reporter Norma Ramirez. Appellant shall include the transcripts of 02/27/07 and 05/16/07 in the appendix to the opening brief. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] | 08-01513 | |
02/26/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 2/27/07 and 5/16/07. Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez. | 08-04699 | |
03/04/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . Opening Brief and Appendix due: 10 days. | 08-05456 | |
03/17/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-06556 | |
03/17/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 2. | 08-06558 | |
03/17/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Appellant's Opening Brief. Due date: 10 days. | 08-06560 | |
03/24/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. | 08-07200 | |
04/17/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 5/16/08. | 08-09605 | |
05/15/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-12281 | |
06/17/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-15394 | |
06/18/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Appellant Counsel's NRAP 28(a) Certificate and Certificate of Mailing. | 08-15647 | |
07/23/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-RP/MD/MC | 08-18936 | |
08/19/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-19850 | |
08/19/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/26/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 21, 2008. | 08-19850 |