judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESCALERA VS. PRADO (CHILD CUSTODY)

Case Information: 49730
Short Caption:ESCALERA VS. PRADO (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D363061Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/20/2007 / Gaston, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/02/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/02/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-14366
07/02/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days. 07-14367
07/02/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days. 07-14368
07/19/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of Tony Liker--check no. 1233.
07/19/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 07-15752
07/20/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert E. Gaston. 07-15901
07/25/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 07-16298
07/30/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-16676
08/02/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-17010
08/02/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. 07-17011
08/08/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing of Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. 07-17485
08/09/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 07-17498
08/27/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 07-18944
08/27/2007MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 07-18945
09/11/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). 07-19978
09/11/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.