Case Information: 53582 | |||
Short Caption: | DEBUNCH VS. STATE, NEV. DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 07OC017111B | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/13/2009 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/20/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/10/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Del Hardy Esq. check no. 13956. | ||
04/10/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-09042 | |
04/13/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson | 09-09100 | |
04/27/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-10327 | |
04/27/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | 09-10328 | |
05/04/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/19/09 | 09-10960 | |
05/04/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement Served on Settlement Judge. | 09-11007 | |
08/24/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-20541 | |
08/27/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 09-20904 | |
09/03/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 09-21468 | |
09/21/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is suspended. Resondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. | 09-22872 | |
10/09/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant. | 09-24754 | |
11/19/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. | 09-28191 | |
01/15/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-01295 | |
01/15/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volumes 1-4. | 10-01296 | |
01/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Supplemental Index to Joint Appendix. (Attached to inside front cover of appendix). | 10-01534 | |
02/03/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-02895 | |
03/04/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-05682 | |
07/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the En Banc Court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 10-18643 | |
07/20/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/17/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-30040 | |
12/13/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-32395 | |
12/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 14, 2010. | 10-32395 |