judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO CARVER

Case Information: 53581
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO CARVERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D383791Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/09/2009How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/10/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
04/10/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 09-09040
04/10/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 09-09041
04/20/2009Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. -Letter requesting court to grant in forma pauperis, requesting assistance in obtaining the names of court reporters, and filling a transcript request. 09-09886
05/15/2009BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 09-12133
06/08/2009MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 09-14298
06/23/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Apellant To Pay Filing Fee Or Comply With Nrap 24(A), Directing Service Of Notice Of Appeal And Directing Transmission Of Record. Filing Fee due: 30 days. Certificate of Service (NOA) due: 20 days. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. fn1[We defer ruling on Catholic Charities of Southern Nevada's June 8, 2009, motion to dismiss appeal.] 09-15564
06/26/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellants Motion to Grant Appeal and Response to Motion to Dismiss by Respondent. 09-15908
07/07/2009Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Letter submitted by J. Guido. (Cert of Service for NOA attached) 09-16573
07/09/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 09-16956
07/09/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/15/2009Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Letter regarding forma pauperis status. 09-17385
08/11/2009Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. -Letter regarding the motion to proceed in forma pauperis. 09-19518
09/09/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-JH/RP/KP fn4[We note that appellant's failure to pay the filing fee could constitute a basis for dismissing this appeal. Nevertheless, we have elected to review this appeal's merits.] 09-21881
09/17/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. 09-22603
09/23/2009Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Letter from John Guido in regards to his Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed in district court 7/24/09. (Motion attached) 09-23121
09/25/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Motion for a Re-Hearing Pursuant to Nevada Rules of Appeallate Procedure N.R.A.P. Rule 40. 09-23532
10/29/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answer. Due 15 days. 09-26633
11/06/2009Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Change of Address for John R. Guido. 09-27217
11/12/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appellant John Guido's Change of Address. 09-27578
11/17/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. 09-28048
11/17/2009AppendixFiled Appendix. To Answering to Petition for Rehearing. 09-28050
11/25/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Grant Appeal. 09-28863
12/04/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. -to John Guido returning, unfiled, the document entitled "Reply to Respondents Answer to Petition for Rehearing". 09-29372
12/17/2009Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed in district court on 12/8/09. (submitted by J. Guido) 09-30674
12/31/2009Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Letter from John Guido regarding misc. issues. 09-31651
12/31/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Request for an Order. 09-31652
12/31/2009BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Memorandum and Brief in Support of Appeal. 09-31653
02/08/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant John Guido returning his letter dated 1/31/10 with attached "Factual Evidence." 10-03440
03/05/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/11/08. 10-05870
03/10/2010Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "We deny the petition for rehearing." NRAP 40(c). Fn1 [In light of this order, we deny petitioner's request for leave to file a reply to the answer to the petition.] Fn3 [Appellant filed a copy of a file-stamped district court order. We conclude that no filing fee is due for this rehearing.] 10-06153
03/22/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant John Guido. This Court will take no action on his notice of appeal to the U.S. District Court. 10-07511
04/06/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-07664
04/06/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/06/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. No action required. Submitted by d.c. clerk but appellant intended for this to be filed with the United States District Court. 10-08861
04/07/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Civil Cover Sheet. (CONFIDENTIAL). 10-09015
04/15/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2010. 10-07664
07/15/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed June 7, 2010 and placed on the docket as Case No. 10-5275. 10-18301
10/13/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. 10-26824
01/13/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certorari Denied. The petition for rehearing is denied. 11-01307