Case Information: 53583 | |||
Short Caption: | MALAGON VS. MALAGON (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - DRMD05028 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/13/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/10/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. WAIVED PER ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. | ||
04/10/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-09062 | |
04/14/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Notice of Motion. Emergency Motion for Modification of Divorce Decree. | 09-09388 | |
04/23/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-10145 | |
04/23/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 09-10146 | |
04/23/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis. | 09-10148 | |
06/16/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing District Court to Rule on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Directing Service of Notice of Appeal, and Directing Transmission of Record. District Court Order due: 30 days. Certificate of Service due: 20 days. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. | 09-14906 | |
07/13/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-17200 | |
07/13/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/31/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respomdent: Michelle Rodriguez. | 09-18785 | |
08/11/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing District Court toRule on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Due: 30 days. | 09-19515 | |
08/17/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Granting Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed in district court on August 14, 2009. | 09-19921 | |
10/08/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/MD/MG fn1[We deny as moot appellant's emergency motion for modification of the divorce decree.] | 09-24630 | |
11/03/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-26291 | |
11/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/12/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 5, 2009. | 09-26291 |