Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/28/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Patrick James Martin--check no. 09952. | | |
06/28/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 07-14184 |
07/05/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | | 07-14610 |
07/06/2007 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from attorney Patrick James Martin who requests that appeal nos. 49720 and 49747 be related. Nos. 49720/49747-cases are not consolidated. | | 07-14738 |
07/11/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 07-15095 |
07/20/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. | | 07-15842 |
08/09/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | | 07-17543 |
08/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Amended Notice of Appeal. | | 07-17964 |
08/21/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. Nos. 49720/49733/49747/49749/49751/49753-cases are not consolidated. | | 07-18453 |
10/29/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 07-23664 |
11/20/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Conclusion of Settlement Proceedings and to Show Cause. Briefing remains suspended. Appellant: 15 days to show cause. | | 07-25280 |
12/03/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Supreme Court Order Dated November 20, 2007. | | 07-26045 |
12/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 07-26800 |
02/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-05175 |
05/12/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. we dismiss the appeals in Docket Nos. 47920 and 49747 as to the July 10, 2007, order striking documents from the record. The appeals may proceed as to the final judgments entered on May 24, 2007, and May 29, 2007. We conclude that judicial economy will be served by consolidating these appeals for all purposes, and we grant Parker's motion. The clerk shall amend the caption to reflect this consolidation. fn6-[Appellant Michael Phillip Gentile's motion to consolidate Docket Nos. 49747 and 49749 is denied as moot.] fn7-[No action will be taken on the letter submitted by attorney Patrick James Martin, filed on July 6, 2007] the settlement judge in Docket No. 49753 has filed a report with this court indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Accordingly, the settlement proceedings are concluded and the appeal in Docket No. 49753 may proceed. Appellants in Docket Nos. 49720, 49747 and 49753 shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. See NRAP 9(a). We reinstate briefing with respect to these consolidated appeals. Appellants shall each have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve their opening briefs and appendices. Appellant Gentile shall file and serve a single opening brief in Docket Nos. 49720, 49747 and 49749. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). In preparing and assembling the appendices, counsel shall strictly comply with the provisions of NRAP 30. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 | | 08-11739 |
05/15/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant's Waiver of Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (Appellant in 49720). Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 [08-12249]. | | 08-12249 |
05/15/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/21/06. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Services. (Appellant in 49747). Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 [08-12252]. | | 08-12252 |
05/22/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. From Appellant in 49753. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-12975 |
05/23/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant Gentile. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 [08-13112]. | | 08-13112 |
06/03/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sunshine Court Reporters stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/21/06. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-14018 |
06/19/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Delivery of Certified Exhibit 1 to Transcript. (Appellant). Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 (08-15663). | | 08-15663 |
07/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 40 pages. Appellant in 49720. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-19201 |
07/31/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger represents a party in a consolidated case. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 | | |
07/31/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Maupin disqualified. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger represents a party in a consolidated case. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 | | 08-19814 |
08/07/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Appellant in 49720/49747/49749. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 (08-20439). | | 08-20439 |
08/07/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 6. Appellant in 49720/49747/49749. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 (08-20440). | | 08-20440 |
08/11/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Appellant, Stewart H. Parker (49753). Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-20712 |
08/11/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Appellant, Stewart H. Parker (49753). Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-20714 |
08/11/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Amended Certificate of Service of: Appellant's Opening Brief and Appellant's Opening Appendix Volumes 1-6. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-20726 |
08/11/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of James Patrick Martin Regarding Joint Appendix. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-20730 |
09/03/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Answering and Reply Briefs. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-22651 |
09/04/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. The stipulation of the parties extending the time for filing the answering brief and reply brief is approved. Respondents S.K. Madan and Shobana Madan: October 8, 2008, to file their answering brief, and appellants shall have until December 8, 2008, to file and serve their reply briefs. Fn1 [This order does not alter the due date for the answering brief of respondent Storey County, currently due on September 10, 2008. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-22802 |
10/08/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondents S.K. Madan and Shobhana Madan. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 (08-25990). | | 08-25990 |
10/08/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 through 2. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 (08-25993). | | 08-25993 |
10/08/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Nevada Bankers Association's Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of District Court Order Declaring Lake Tahoe Recreational Land Company Deed of Trust Valid and Enforceable. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 (08-26001). | | 08-26001 |
10/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We grant NBA's motion to file an amicus brief. The clerk shall file NBA's brief of amicus curiae received on 10/8/08. Appellants shall each have until 12/8/08 to file and serve a single brief. Storey County shall have 10 days to file an answering brief or joinder in the answering brief of S.K. Madan and Shobhana madan. Storey County cautioned. Nos. 49720/4974/49749/49753 (08-27240). | | 08-27240 |
10/23/2008 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. Brief of Amicus Curiae of Nevada Bankers Association in Support of District Court Order Declaring Lake Tahoe Recreational Land Company Deed of Trust Valid and Enorceable. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-26004 |
11/06/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Supreme Court Order of October 23, 2008. Submitted by attorney Brent Kolvet (counsel for respondent Storey County in 49747). Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-28455 |
11/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. The Class Observations with Respect to Storey County's Response to Supreme Court Order of October 23, 2008. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-28721 |
12/01/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellants' Motion for Leave to File Combine Reply - Answering Brief in Excess of 30 Pages Expedited Relief Respectfully Requested. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-30463 |
12/05/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Briefing Schedule and Granting Motion. We elect to treat Storey County's response as a waiver of Storey County's right to file an answering brief. Pursuant to the briefing schedule set forth in our order of October 23, 2008, appellants shall have until December 8, 2008, to file and serve a single brief of not more than 50 pages containing (1) the reply brief to the Madan respondents' answering brief and (2) the answering brief to the Nevada Banker's Association's brief of amicus curiae. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-31089 |
12/05/2008 | Brief | Filed Joinder to Brief. Appellant, Stewart H. Parker's, Joinder in Appellant's Reply-Answering Brief. (49753). Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 08-31105 |
12/05/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellants' Reply - Answering Brief. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 (08-31106). | | 08-31106 |
12/05/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief. Appellants' Reply - Answering Brief Appendix. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 (08-31108). | | 08-31108 |
06/17/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is hereby scheduled before the en banc court on Monday, August 31, 2009, at the hour of 10:00 a.m., in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 09-14955 |
07/16/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on August 31, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. (En Banc) Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 09-17456 |
08/18/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion For Leave to File Errata to Appellants' Reply-Answering Brief filed December 5, 2008. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. (DETACHED AND FILED EXHIBITS 1 AND 2 PER ORDER 09/08/09). | | 09-20008 |
08/18/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Affidavit of Mailing- Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Errata to: Appellants' Reply - Answering Brief Filed December 5, 2008. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 (09-20034). | | 09-20034 |
08/18/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 09-20060 |
08/31/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
09/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Leave to File Errata. The clerk of this court shall detach from Gentile's motion and file Exhibits 1 and 2. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 09-21708 |
09/08/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. Appellant's Errata to Appellants' Reply - Answering Brief. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 09-21713 |
09/08/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. Appellant's Errata to Appellants' Reply - Answering Brief Appendix. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 09-21716 |
12/16/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC-JH/RP/MD/MC/NS/MG/KP Nos. 49720/49747/79749/49753. | | 09-30548 |
12/31/2009 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753 (09-31649). | | 09-31649 |
12/31/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. E-Payment $150 from Patrick James Martin | | |
02/16/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 10-04048 |
03/16/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 10-04903 |
03/16/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/24/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 2010. | | 10-04903 |
05/10/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari filed. An application for extension of time to file a petition for writ of certiorari has been granted until July 16, 2010. Nos. 49720/49747/79749/49753. [10-12102] | | 10-12102 |
07/26/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on July 15, 2010 and placed on the docket as Case No. 10-117. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 10-19160 |
10/13/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. Nos. 49720/49747/49749/49753. | | 10-26825 |