Case Information: 49690 | |||
Short Caption: | METABOLIC INDUSTRIES VS. TRINITY HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS, LLC | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0305073 Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0305179 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 07/03/2007 / Berry, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/26/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hoy & Hoy - check no. 010441. | ||
06/26/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-13926 | |
06/27/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | 07-14041 | |
07/03/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert G. Berry. | 07-14555 | |
07/11/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 07-15066 | |
07/11/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 07-15067 | |
07/13/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal served on Settlement Judge. | 07-15209 | |
07/18/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 07-15693 | |
07/19/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 07-15766 | |
07/27/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). | 07-16593 | |
07/27/2007 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |