judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MAY (MAURICE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49689
Short Caption:MAY (MAURICE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 56344
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C214102Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/26/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 07-13916
07/17/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The deadlines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are suspended until further order of this court. 07-15549
07/23/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 05/02/07. Court Reporter: Sonia Riley-Bennett. Filed in district court on: 07/17/07. 07-16089
07/30/2007TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sonia L. Riley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. 07-16747
09/25/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. 07-21133
10/23/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-22162
10/23/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/01/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 29, 2007. 07-22162