Case Information: 49711 | |||
Short Caption: | JIMERSON (REX) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44593 , 44975 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C180316 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/29/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/28/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/28/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-14115 | |
07/20/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-15867 | |
08/29/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-19123 | |
08/29/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/08/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 07-24472 | |
12/04/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-26060 | |
12/04/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/19/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2007. | 07-26060 |