Case Information: 49707 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIAMS (DATARI) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C203653 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/28/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/28/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/28/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-14107 | |
07/20/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-15871 | |
08/28/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-19047 | |
08/28/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/03/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 07-21870 | |
10/30/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-22201 | |
10/30/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/09/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 1, 2007. | 07-22201 |