Case Information: 49722 | |||
Short Caption: | MCCONNELL (ROBERT) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40784 , 42101 , 71061 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR021938 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/07/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/29/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/29/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-14298 | |
07/10/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-15014 | |
07/23/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | 07-15998 | |
07/25/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 07-16276 | |
10/25/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 07-23528 | |
11/01/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Stipulation Approved. Opening brief and appendix due: November 26, 2007. | 07-24039 | |
11/13/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant Robert Lee McConnells' Motion to File Opening Brief in Excess of Thirty (30) Pages. | 07-24757 | |
11/29/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the 80 page opening brief and the joint appendix received on November 13, 2007. | 07-25746 | |
11/29/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-24758 | |
11/29/2007 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. | 07-24760 | |
12/31/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-28308 | |
01/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: 1/31/08. | 08-01297 | |
01/23/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-01748 | |
02/14/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 08-03749 | |
02/21/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: March 24, 2008. | 08-04195 | |
03/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. 60 days to file the reply brief. | 08-07329 | |
03/25/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. For Thomas L. Qualls, Esq. | 08-07345 | |
03/28/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Appellant's counsel shall have until May 23, 2008, to file and serve the reply brief. | 08-07812 | |
04/10/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Thomas L. Qualls as co-counsel for Appellant. | 08-08939 | |
05/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-13072 | |
05/29/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We conclude that appellant has demonstrated extraordinary circumstances and extreme need warranting an extension of time. Reply brief due: 6/23/08. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-13583 | |
06/20/2008 | Brief | Received Reply Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 07/07/08.) | 08-15923 | |
06/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant Robert Lee McConnell's Motion to File Reply Brief in Excess of Thirty (30) pages. | 08-16135 | |
07/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the 39-page reply brief received on June 20, 2008. | 08-17171 | |
07/07/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-15923 | |
07/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/30/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave of Court to File Supplemental Opening Brief Pursuant to Intervening Case Indiana v. Edwards, 128 S.Ct. 2379 (2008). | 09-16121 | |
07/21/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion to File Supplemental Opening Brief. | 09-17826 | |
07/23/2009 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 24. EN BANC. | 09-17990 | |
07/24/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Correcting Opinion. The clerk of this court is directed to correct the third full sentence on page 15 of this court's advance opinion. | 09-18206 | |
08/11/2009 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Appellant. | 09-19546 | |
10/06/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 09-24428 | |
11/03/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-26403 | |
11/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/12/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 4, 2009. | 09-26403 | |
01/06/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice pursuant to SCR 250(10(a) re: Warrant of Execution. | 10-00272 |