Case Information: 49713 | |||
Short Caption: | BELSSNER VS. EGGERT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A539018 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/28/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/28/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-14142 | |
07/05/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Notice to Appeal | 07-14583 | |
07/05/2007 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Clark Co. Clerk stating that because this notice of appeal was submitted directly to the Supreme Court and forwarded to the District Court, it was filed after the "amended notice of appeal" was filed and is being processed as an amended notice of appeal. (The amended notice of appeal was filed in the district court on 6/21/07 and filed in this office on 6/28/07.) | 07-14584 | |
07/16/2007 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter dated July 11, 2007 w/attached Order to Dismiss without Prejudice. | 07-15394 | |
09/05/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. " ORDER we DISMISS this appeal." Fn4 [In light of this order, we deny as moot all motions pending in this appeal.] SNP07-MG/MD/MC. | 07-19541 | |
10/02/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-19691 | |
10/02/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/12/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2007. | 07-19691 |