judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CROCKETT (THOMAS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36312
Short Caption:CROCKETT (THOMAS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34850
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C144007Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/20/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10514
07/19/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed 6/28/00. Due Date: 10 days
07/31/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order filed in district court on June 28, 2000. 00-13238
08/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15278
09/26/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15443
09/26/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 30, 2000, this court dismissed appellant's appeal. Although appellant has not been granted leave to file documents in proper person, this court has received several proper person filings. This court has considered and rejected the relief requested in these documents. 00-17481
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-15443