judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LANIER ASSOCIATES V. LILIA SOLANO

Case Information: 10-CV-1180
Short Caption:LANIER ASSOCIATES V. LILIA SOLANOClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB11471-10Filed Date:09/14/2010

Opening Event Date:09/14/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/05/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLanier AssociatesN
Stephen O. HesslerNY
AppelleeLilia Solano N
Shankar Duraiswamy NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (189-pgs/johnson 8/16/10 proc.)w/cd attached
10/12/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER... (BY: ETW)
10/12/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
10/13/2010RECORD INDEX
10/29/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
12/13/2010 ORDRED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED. (OBNBFA) (jl)
12/13/2010DISMISSED
01/05/2011ERROR-REUSE
01/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED