Case Information: 49724 | |||
Short Caption: | BAX (CHARLES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55797 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR062519 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/29/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/29/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-14305 | |
08/02/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-16974 | |
08/28/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-17077 | |
08/28/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/11/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 31, 2007. | 07-17077 |