Case Information: 49725 | |||
Short Caption: | SIMON (TERRANCE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46737 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C215984 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/28/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/29/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/29/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-14309 | |
07/20/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-15868 | |
08/28/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-19049 | |
08/28/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/08/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 08-00488 | |
02/05/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-01941 | |
02/05/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/08/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 6, 2008. | 08-01941 |