Case Information: 49686 | |||
Short Caption: | URIBE (FREDI) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C219358 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/26/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/26/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-13911 | |
07/23/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-16037 | |
07/23/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-16039 | |
07/26/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-16484 | |
07/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. counsel for appellant shall have seven days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as moot. If deemed necessary, respondent may file any reply within five days from the filing of appellant's response. | 08-18331 | |
07/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response. | 08-19272 | |
09/08/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-23032 | |
09/19/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 9/8/08 to Fredi Uribe. Per NDOC "Paroled". No forwarding address. | 08-24255 | |
10/03/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-23283 | |
10/03/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/13/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 7, 2008. | 08-23283 |