Case Information: 49701 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE BD. OF EQUALIZATION VS. BAKST | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46752 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0301501A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/27/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/27/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-14011 | |
07/12/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 07-15194 | |
07/12/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-15195 | |
11/02/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-24105 | |
11/02/2007 | Brief | Received Opening Brief. | 07-24106 | |
11/02/2007 | Appendix | Received Appendix to Opening Brief. | 07-24107 | |
11/14/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed November 2, 2007. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on November 2, 2007. Respondent's Answering Brief due: 30 days. | 07-24783 | |
11/14/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-24106 | |
11/14/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 07-24107 | |
12/11/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 14, 2008. | 07-26917 | |
01/11/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-00797 | |
01/11/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 08-00798 | |
02/08/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-03191 | |
03/20/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as moot. | 08-06873 | |
03/28/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellants' State of Nevda Board of Equalization, Nevada Tax Commission, and Department of Taxation Motion in Response to Order to Show Cause. | 08-07785 | |
04/15/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. to File Respodents' Reply to Order to Show Cause. | 08-09376 | |
04/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents Reply due: May 2, 2008. | 08-10776 | |
05/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Respondents' Reply to Order to Show Cause & Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Response to Order to Show Cause. | 08-11015 | |
05/22/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." CA08-RP/MD/MC [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12903 | |
06/17/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13180 | |
06/17/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/25/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 18, 2008. | 08-13180 |