Case Information: 49697 | |||
Short Caption: | JACK WHITE CUSTOM HOMES VS. BURRIDGE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45323 , 46662 , 47612 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 03CV0168 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/26/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Sullivan Law Offices-check no. 9462. | ||
06/26/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-13992 | |
06/26/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | 07-14006 | |
06/27/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days. | 07-14018 | |
07/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 46662/47612/49697 (46662 and 47612 are already consolidated). | 07-14739 | |
07/11/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Consolidation of Appeals. Nos. 46662/47612/49697. (46662/47612 are already consolidated (07-15084)). | 07-15085 | |
07/13/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-15252 | |
07/16/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Reference Transcript filed in Case Number 46662 in Lieu of Transcript Request. | 07-15422 | |
07/19/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Reference Transcript; Motion to Compel Filing of Transcript. | 07-15768 | |
07/31/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's NRAP Rule 8(a) Application for Approval of a Supersedeas Bond or Such Other Security or Relief as the Court Deems Proper. | 07-16793 | |
08/01/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We deny the motion to consolidate Docket No. 49697 with Docket Nos. 46662 and 47612. This denial is without prejudice to White's right to renew such a motion upon completion of briefing in Docket No. 49697, if White considers such a motion appropriate at that time. Nos. 46662/47612 - 49697 not consolidated. | 07-16891 | |
08/01/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Compel Filing of Transcript. | 07-16933 | |
08/14/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to "Appellant's NRAP Rule 8(a) Application for Approval of a Supersedeas Bond or Such Other Security or Relief as the Court Deems Proper." | 07-17940 | |
08/14/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant: 15 days to show cause. Briefing suspended. Respondents may file a reply 10 days after response is served. | 07-17946 | |
08/20/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Sanctions. | 07-18373 | |
08/30/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 07-19173 | |
09/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. to Order to Show Cause. | 07-19919 | |
10/15/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Agreed Motion for Extension. | 07-22752 | |
10/22/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. Fn4 [In light of the dismissal of this appeal, we deny these pending requests as moot. We have considered the requests and conclude that sanctions are not warrented. Accordingly, we deny the requests.] | 07-23188 | |
10/29/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. of 10/15/07 as Moot. | 07-23697 | |
11/16/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-24915 | |
11/16/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/03/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2007. | 07-24915 |