Case Information: 49702 | |||
Short Caption: | ANDREE-JANSZ VS. FU | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A499981 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/27/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Tony Andree-Jansz (Belma V. Aspiras--check no. 1984). | ||
06/27/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-14067 | |
10/12/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "As we lack jurisdiction over this appeal, we dismiss it." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 07-22631 | |
11/06/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-22717 | |
11/06/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/16/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2007. | 07-22717 |