Case Information: 49703 | |||
Short Caption: | SMITH (ROBERT) VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 32283 , 38216 , 51078 , 55078 , 74617 , 74617-COA , 82411 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C128262 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/27/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/27/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-14051 | |
07/27/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Response. State's response due: 30 days. | 07-16543 | |
08/28/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order of the Court. | 07-19023 | |
09/10/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 07-19834 | |
10/05/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-20185 | |
10/05/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |