judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNSON (NEHEMIAH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49692
Short Caption:JOHNSON (NEHEMIAH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C232071Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/26/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 07-13920
06/26/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/23/07. Court Reporter: Sonia Riley. Filed in district court on: June 18, 2007. 07-13921
06/26/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. 07-13922
06/29/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 05/23/07. Court Reporter: Sonia Riley-Bennett. Filed in district court on: 06/18/07. (Previously filed on 06/26/07. Includes affidavit of service.) 07-14325
07/02/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Affidavit of Service of Request for Rough Draft Transcript on District Attorney. 07-14468
07/30/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 07-16748
07/30/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 07-16749
08/15/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 07-18044
11/16/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. 07-24972
12/12/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-26387
12/12/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/21/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2007. 07-26387