judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEWIS (NICHOLAS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49687
Short Caption:LEWIS (NICHOLAS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C212052Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/26/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 07-13914
06/26/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/14/05, 8/11/05, 5/25/06, 1/4/07, 1/8/07, 1/9/07, 1/10/07, 2/13/07 and 5/17/07. Court Reporters: Janie Olsen, Richard Kangas and Sharon Howard. Filed in district court on: June 19, 2007. 07-13915
06/29/2007TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/14/05 and 8/11/05. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. Proceedings: 5/25/06. Court Reporter: Richard Kangas. 07-14275
07/19/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-15831
07/26/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Transcripts due: 45 days. 07-16375
08/08/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-17399
08/13/2007TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. 07-17879
08/16/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Fast Track Statement due: 20 days. 07-18065
08/16/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Fast Track Statement due: 20 days. 07-18065
09/10/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-19938
09/13/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days. Counsel for appellant is cautioned that further extensions will not be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-20220
09/19/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-20687
09/25/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: 5 days. 07-21081
09/26/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-21281
09/27/2007MotionFiled Motion. Appellant Lewis' Motion for Leave to File 21-Page Fast Track Statement. 07-21329
10/03/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on September 27, 2007. 07-21867
10/03/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 07-21330
10/03/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 07-21331
10/29/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 14 pages. 07-23616
10/29/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 07-23617
05/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . Court Recorder Sharon Howard shall file the requested transcripts in this court within 15 days of the date of this order. 08-11738
05/19/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 01/08/07, 01/09/07, and 01/10/07. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. 08-12502
05/21/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/08-1/10/07. 08-12816
09/26/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Copy of Transcripts dated 1/04/07, 2/13/07, and 5/17/08. Case #C212052. Due Date: 10 days 08-24892
10/06/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 4, 2007; February 13, 2007; and May 17, 2007. Submitted by District Court Clerk. 08-25836
12/16/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We affirm the judgment of conviction for stop required on signal of a police officer. We reverse the judgment of conviction for the category B felony possession of a stolen vehicle, vacate the $5,200 order of restitution, and remand this matter to the district court with instructions to enter a judgment of conviction for a category C felony possession of a stolen vehicle, for resentencing, and for further proceedings consistent with this order." SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-31891
01/13/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-00383
01/13/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/21/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 15, 2009. 09-00383