Case Information: 49726 | |||
Short Caption: | PERSON (JEREMY) VS. STATE C/W 49727/49728 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 49726*, 49727 , 49728 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Storey Co. - First Judicial District - CR19940 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/29/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/29/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-14312 | |
06/29/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/29/07. Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Services. Filed in district court on: June 27, 2007. | 07-14313 | |
07/09/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 5/29/07. Court Reporter: Stephanie Zolkowski. | 07-14949 | |
08/09/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: August 15, 2007. | 07-17539 | |
08/15/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-18024 | |
08/15/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. | 07-18025 | |
08/31/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: September 11, 2007. | 07-19374 | |
09/11/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-20021 | |
12/06/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We have elected to consolidate these appeals for disposition."ORDER the judgments of conviction AFFIRMED." Nos. 49726/49727/49728. NNP08G-MG/MC/NS | 07-26465 | |
01/02/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-00006 | |
01/02/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/10/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2008. | 08-00006 |