Case Information: 49709 | |||
Short Caption: | BERRY (DURAND) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54706 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C220473 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 10/15/2008 at 11:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Regional Justice Center |
Submission Date: | 10/15/2008 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/28/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/28/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-14108 | |
06/28/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/21/06, 3/28/06, 4/18/06, 5/2/06, 7/25/06, 7/27/06, 11/2/06, 3/29/07, 4/3/07, 4/4/07, 4/5/07, 4/9/07, 4/10/07, 5/15/07 and 5/29/07. Court Reporters: Kiara Schmidt and Janie Olsen. Filed in district court on: June 21, 2007. | 07-14109 | |
07/16/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 3/21/06, 3/28/06, 4/18/06 and 5/2/06. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. | 07-15403 | |
07/30/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 7/25/06, 7/27/06, 11/2/06, 3/29/07, 4/3/07, 4/4/07, 4/5/07, 4/9/07, 4/10/07, 5/15/07 and 5/29/07. Court Reporter: Janie L. Olsen. | 07-16750 | |
08/13/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-17788 | |
08/15/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Motion Granted in Part. Fast Track Statement due: 30 days. | 07-18047 | |
09/24/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Berry's Motion for Extension of Time. | 07-21013 | |
09/24/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant Berry's Motion for Leave to File 34-Page Fast Track Statement. | 07-21014 | |
10/05/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motions and Directing Full Briefing. The motion for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages and the motion for an extension of time in which to file the fast track statement are denied. The clerk of this court shall return unfiled, the fast track statement and appendix received on September 24, 2007. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. Appellant: 20 days to file the opening brief and appendix | 07-21974 | |
10/05/2007 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. | 07-21016 | |
10/05/2007 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Fast Track Appendix. | 07-21017 | |
10/23/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 35 pages. Opening Brief. | 07-23352 | |
10/23/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-23353 | |
10/23/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 07-23354 | |
11/28/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 07-25532 | |
12/21/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 22, 2008. | 07-27717 | |
01/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-02021 | |
08/26/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 15, 2008 at 11:30 a.m. (SNP08-JH/RP/MD) | 08-21947 | |
10/02/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 08-25436 | |
10/15/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP08-JH/RP/MD | ||
07/30/2009 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded with instructions." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, James W.. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 26. EN BANC. | 09-18589 | |
08/25/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-19149 | |
08/25/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/02/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 28, 2009. | 09-19149 |